Math Club
jiunge
Fanpop
New Post
Explore Fanpop
posted by Subhamita
..::: Shortcut of Multplication :::...

To multiply= 96X97
subtract each number from 100
96X97
4 3

****************************

subtract diagnoly 96-3 au 97-4
ans will be same=93
multiply the no. 4X3=12
=9312
TO multiply= 18X32

****************************

subtract each number kwa 30 au 20
(30) (20)
18X32 18X32
12 2 2 12
now multiply 12X2 which is equal to 24
and 20X30=600
subtract 600-24=576
answer is 576


****************************

subtraction
7254
- 3857
ANS=3357
how do we get this..
take 7 from10
then add the number
(4 to get 7)
subtact from power 10 .
subtract all number like this..
TO subtract 40,000 from 2,745
-take 1 from the digit(4)
to get3,the first digit..
TO SUBTRACT 1000 from574
-this is the right hand digit of the answer
- now take the other digits away from 9.Take 1 from the first digit.
-4 from 10 is 6,7 from 9 is 2,5 from 9 is 4 and 1 from is 0
Therefore the answer is 426